Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roque José Carpegna Díaz, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China

Titular Bishop of Theveste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1760Born
177817.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
31 Mar 180140.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fukien, Chekiang, and Kiangsi, China
31 Mar 180140.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Theveste
23 Jan 180342.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theveste
15 Oct 181252.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of Fukien, Chekiang, and Kiangsi, China
30 Dec 184585.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China

MicroData Summary for Roque José Carpegna Díaz
Bishop Roque José Carpegna Díaz O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYecla, Diocese of Cartagena (en España)
Ordained BishopMacau, Diocese of Macau
Death PlaceTingtao

  • a bishop for 42.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1803, Number 2
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 361
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 123, Number 650
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 236

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 12 Apr 2021

Quantcast