Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Chittilapilly

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Thamarasserry (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1934Born
18 Oct 196127.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 Apr 198854.2AppointedBishop of Kalyan (Syro-Malabar), India
24 Aug 198854.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kalyan (Syro-Malabar), India
11 Nov 199662.7AppointedBishop of Thamarasserry (Syro-Malabar), India
15 Jan 201075.9RetiredBishop of Thamarasserry (Syro-Malabar), India
6 Sep 202086.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Thamarasserry (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Paul Chittilapilly (VIAF: 317284729)
Bishop Paul Chittilapilly (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Thamarasserry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMattom
Ordained BishopMatunga grounds, Don Bosco, Church, Bombay
Death PlaceKozhikode

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,915
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,449
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 6 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast