Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leo Peter Kierkels, C.P. †

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to India

Titular Archbishop of Salamis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1882Born
22 Dec 190624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
23 Mar 193148.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Salamis
23 Mar 193148.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to India
26 Apr 193148.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Salamis
1 Jul 194865.5AppointedApostolic Internuncio to India
29 Jun 195269.5ResignedApostolic Internuncio to India
7 Nov 195774.9DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to India

MicroData Summary for Leo Peter Kierkels (VIAF: 89107582)
Archbishop Leo Peter Kierkels C.P. (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of India

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaexem, Diocese of Roermond, Netherlands

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1931, Number 18
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 149
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 680, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 30 Nov 2020

Quantcast