Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eduardo José Castillo Pino

Archbishop of Portoviejo, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1970 Born
20 Nov 199424.6Ordained PriestPriest of Guayaquil, Ecuador
14 Mar 201241.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Portoviejo, Ecuador
14 Mar 201241.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tarasa in Byzacena
1 Jun 201242.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tarasa in Byzacena
14 Sep 201848.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Portoviejo, Ecuador
2 Oct 201949.5AppointedArchbishop of Portoviejo, Ecuador
30 Nov 201949.6InstalledArchbishop of Portoviejo, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Eduardo José Castillo Pino
Archbishop Eduardo José Castillo Pino (born ) Archbishop of Portoviejo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuayaquil
Ordained BishopCathedral, Portoviejo, Archdiocese of Portoviejo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Portoviejo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Mar 2012
  • ob: CB, 2 May 2012
  • c2+: CB, 23 May 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,440
  • aadm: CB, 14 Sep 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Oct 2019
  • i: AM, 7 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast