Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo Cirilo Carmona Ortega, C.O.R.C.

Bishop of Córdoba, Veracruz, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1959 Born
20 Aug 198324.4Ordained PriestPriest of Tacámbaro, Michoacán, México
1991²31.7IncardinatedPriest of Workers of the Kingdom of Christ
8 Nov 200344.6AppointedBishop of Puerto Escondido, Oaxaca, México
7 Jan 200444.8Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Escondido, Oaxaca, México
27 Jun 201253.2AppointedBishop of Parral, Chihuahua, México
25 Jul 201253.3InstalledBishop of Parral, Chihuahua, México
6 Nov 201960.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Córdoba, Veracruz, México
4 Jul 202061.2SucceededBishop of Córdoba, Veracruz, México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Cirilo Carmona Ortega
Bishop Eduardo Cirilo Carmona Ortega C.O.R.C. (born ) Bishop of Córdoba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMexico City, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Ordained BishopOn the Zicatela beach, Puerto Escondido, Diocese of Puerto Escondido, Oaxaca

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Córdoba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,497
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Nov 2019
  • s: Bollettino, 4 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast