Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop 聲gel Francisco Caraballo Ferm璯

Bishop of Cabimas, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1965 Born
7 Dec 199126.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ciudad Guayana, Venezuela
30 Nov 201247.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Maracaibo, Venezuela
30 Nov 201247.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Dagnum
16 Feb 201347.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dagnum
28 Sep 201752.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cabimas, Venezuela
29 Jan 201953.6AppointedBishop of Cabimas, Venezuela
23 Mar 201953.8InstalledBishop of Cabimas, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for 聲gel Francisco Caraballo Ferm璯
Bishop 聲gel Francisco Caraballo Ferm璯 (born ) Bishop of Cabimas

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuerto Ordaz
Ordained BishopGimnasio de las Hermanas Gonz嫮ez, Puerto Ordaz

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cabimas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2012
  • ob: CB, 22 Jan 2013
  • c2+: CB, 17 Feb 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,657
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Jan 2019
  • i: CB, 10 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast