Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Lucien-Marie-Joseph Cadilhac

Deceased

Bishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1931Born
29 Jun 195523.7Ordained PriestPriest
5 Sep 197341.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France
5 Sep 197341.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Segermes
14 Oct 197342.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Segermes
16 Mar 197846.4AppointedBishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès), France
27 Oct 199968.0DiedBishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Lucien-Marie-Joseph Cadilhac (VIAF: 7430568)
Bishop Jean-Lucien-Marie-Joseph Cadilhac (born , died ) Bishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFraisse-Cabardès
Ordained BishopCathedral, Montauban, Diocese of Montauban

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,204

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast