Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Reinaldo Cáceres González

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Melo, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1921Born
15 Jul 194524.2Ordained PriestPriest of Montevideo, Uruguay
2 Jan 196240.7AppointedBishop of Melo, Uruguay
19 Mar 196240.9Ordained BishopBishop of Melo, Uruguay
23 Apr 199675.0RetiredBishop of Melo, Uruguay
13 Jan 201997.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Melo, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Roberto Reinaldo Cáceres González
Bishop Roberto Reinaldo Cáceres González (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Melo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires, Argentina
Ordained BishopCathedral, Montevideo, Archdiocese of Montevideo
Death PlaceMontevideo, Archdiocese of Montevideo
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Melo, Diocese of Melo

  • a priest for 73.4 years
  • a bishop for 56.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1962, Number 20
  • d: CB, 13 Jan 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 48, Number 3,296

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast