Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Arturo Mullín Nocetti, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Minas, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1914Born
21 Dec 194632.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
1 Mar 197257.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Minas, Uruguay
1 Mar 197257.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Birtha
13 May 197257.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Birtha
3 Nov 197763.3AppointedBishop of Minas, Uruguay
17 Mar 198570.6DiedBishop of Minas, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Carlos Arturo Mullín Nocetti
Bishop Carlos Arturo Mullín Nocetti S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Minas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontevideo, Archdiocese of Montevideo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Minas, Diocese of Minas

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,030

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast