Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Peter Beňo

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Nitra, Slovakia

Titular Bishop of Amudarsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1972 Born
14 Sep 199624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Nitra, Slovakia
29 Jan 202148.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nitra, Slovakia
29 Jan 202148.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Amudarsa
24 Apr 202148.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amudarsa

MicroData Summary for Peter Beňo
Father Peter Beňo (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Nitra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBánovce nad Bebravou
Ordained BishopSv. Andreja-Svorada a Beňadika, Skaka nad Váhom

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Nitra.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jan 2021
  • c1: CB, 1 Feb 2021
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Apr 2021

Quantcast