Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Federico Guba Limon, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Lingayen-Dagupan, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1915Born
14 May 194226.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
7 Jan 197256.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Lingayen-Dagupan, Philippines
7 Jan 197256.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aquaviva
13 Feb 197256.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Aquaviva
7 Feb 197357.3SucceededArchbishop of Lingayen-Dagupan, Philippines
15 Jul 199175.7RetiredArchbishop of Lingayen-Dagupan, Philippines
13 Jun 199680.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Lingayen-Dagupan, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Federico Guba Limon
Archbishop Federico Guba Limon S.V.D. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lingayen-Dagupan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMangaldan
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • mn: CB, 25 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Number 896

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast