Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Powathil

Archbishop Emeritus of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1930 Born
3 Oct 196232.1Ordained PriestPriest of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar), India
7 Jan 197241.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar), India
7 Jan 197241.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea Philippi
13 Feb 197241.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea Philippi
26 Feb 197746.5AppointedBishop of Kanjirapally (Syro-Malabar), India
5 Nov 198555.2AppointedArchbishop of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar), India
22 Jan 200776.4RetiredArchbishop of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Powathil
Archbishop Joseph Powathil (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Changanacherry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKurumbanadam
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Number 903

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast