Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Antonius de Kok, O.F.M.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Utrecht, Netherlands

Titular Bishop of Trevico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1930 Born
11 Mar 195625.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
15 Jan 198251.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
15 Jan 198251.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Trevico
6 Mar 198251.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trevico
27 Aug 200574.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Johannes Antonius de Kok
Bishop Johannes Antonius de Kok O.F.M. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Utrecht

EventPlace
Birth Place's-Gravenhage
Ordained BishopSte. Catherine, Cathedral, Utrecht, Archdiocese of Utrecht

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Utrecht.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Aug 2005
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,853

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast