Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Fantozzi, C.Pp.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Veroli, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Dara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1853Born
12 Jul 190956.0AppointedBishop of Veroli, Italy
12 Sep 190956.1Ordained BishopBishop of Veroli, Italy
1 Jan 193177.4RetiredBishop of Veroli, Italy
1 Jan 193177.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Dara
14 Jan 193278.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Veroli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Fantozzi
Archbishop Luigi Fantozzi C.Pp.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Veroli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSigillo
Ordained BishopBasilica, Albano

  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1909, Number 57
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,913

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast