Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Youssef Aboul El Kher

Bishop Emeritus of Sohag (Coptic), Egypt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1943 Born
17 Sep 197228.9Ordained PriestPriest of Sohag (Coptic), Egypt
5 Aug 200359.8SelectedBishop of Sohag (Coptic), Egypt
9 Aug 200359.8ConfirmedBishop of Sohag (Coptic), Egypt
13 Nov 200360.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sohag (Coptic), Egypt
14 Jun 201975.7RetiredBishop of Sohag (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Youssef Aboul El Kher
Bishop Youssef Aboul El Kher (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Sohag

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQum-Gharib
Ordained BishopCathedral, Sohag, Eparchy of Sohag (Coptic)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Sohag (Coptic).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,480
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 24 Jan 2021

Quantcast