Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Marco II Khouzam

Deceased

Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt

Bishop of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1888Born
30 Apr 191123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Luqsor {Tebe} (Coptic), Egypt
10 Aug 192638.4AppointedBishop of Luqsor {Tebe} (Coptic), Egypt
30 Nov 192638.7Ordained BishopBishop of Luqsor {Tebe} (Coptic), Egypt
10 Aug 194759.4AppointedPatriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
10 Aug 194759.4AppointedBishop of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
2 Feb 195869.8DiedPatriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Marco II Khouzam (VIAF: 316451346)
Patriarch Marco II Khouzam (born , died ) Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAkhim

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,897
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1926, Number 80
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 713, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast