Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isabelo Caiban Abarquez

Bishop of Calbayog, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1956 Born
23 Jun 198730.9Ordained PriestPriest of Cebu, Philippines
27 Dec 200246.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cebu, Philippines
27 Dec 200246.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Talaptula
18 Feb 200346.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Talaptula
19 Jun 200447.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palo, Philippines
5 Jan 200750.4AppointedBishop of Calbayog, Philippines
8 Mar 200750.6InstalledBishop of Calbayog, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Isabelo Caiban Abarquez
Bishop Isabelo Caiban Abarquez (born ) Bishop of Calbayog

EventPlace
Birth PlacePanlaan, Archdiocese of Cebu
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cebu, Archdiocese of Cebu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Calbayog.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,330
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Jul 2021

Quantcast