Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Augustine McFaul

Deceased

Bishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1850Born
26 May 187726.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 189444.1AppointedBishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
18 Oct 189444.3Ordained BishopBishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
16 Jun 191767.0DiedBishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for James Augustine McFaul (VIAF: 92794127)
Bishop James Augustine McFaul (born , died ) Bishop of Trenton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLarne, Ireland
Ordained BishopSte. Marie, Cathedral, Trenton, Diocese of Trenton, New Jersey

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 564
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017