Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Sorin, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Port Moresby, Papua New Guinea

Titular Bishop of Antiphrae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1903Born
4 Aug 192926.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
13 Jun 194643.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Port Moresby, Papua New Guinea
13 Jun 194643.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Antiphrae
24 Aug 194643.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antiphrae
19 Apr 195955.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Port Moresby, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for André Sorin
Bishop André Sorin M.S.C. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Port Moresby

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLes Sables d'Olonne, France

  • a priest for 29.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1946, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast