Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Li Suguang

Bishop of Nanchang [Nanchang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1964² Born
22 Aug 199228.6Ordained PriestPriest
Jul 2009³45.5SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Nanchang [Nanchang], China
31 Oct 201046.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Nanchang [Nanchang], China
25 Aug 201450.6SucceededBishop of Nanchang [Nanchang], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Li Suguang
Bishop John Baptist Li Suguang (born 1964) Bishop of Nanchang [Nanchang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChangzi
Ordained BishopNanchang, Archdiocese of Nanchang [Nanchang]

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Nanchang [Nanchang].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast