Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Yujiang [YŁkiang]

Dioecesis Iuchiamensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Nanchang [Nanchang]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Yujiang, Jiangxi, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Orientale}
28 August 1885ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Settentrionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Orientale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Fu-Chow (Fu-Kow)
25 August 1920Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Orientale} Vicariate Apostolic of Fu-Chow (Fu-Kow)
Vicariate Apostolic of YŁkiang [Yujiang]
1 June 1921Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Fu-Chow (Fu-Kow) Vicariate Apostolic of YŁkiang [Yujiang]
Diocese of Yujiang [YŁkiang]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of YŁkiang [Yujiang] Diocese of Yujiang [YŁkiang]

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.2, 22 Oct 2012; data: 10 Dec 2012