Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Antoine Anot, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi}, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1814Born
6 Oct 184026.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
21 May 184228.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
1860²45.6AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi}, China
1865²50.6ResignedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi}, China
21 Nov 189379.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi}, China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine Anot
Father Antoine Anot C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMenneville, France
Death PlaceFou-tcheou fou

  • a priest for 51.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,860
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast