Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Xinyang [Sinyang]

Dioecesis Siniamensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kaifeng [Kaifeng]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 30,000 (11,587 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Xinyang, Henan, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Sinyangchow
15 December 1927ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Sinyangchow (erected)
2 March 1933Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Nanyang [Nanyang]
Prefecture Apostolic of Sinyangchow
Prefecture Apostolic of Chumatien [Zhumadian] (erected)
25 May 1933ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Sinyangchow
Vicariate Apostolic of Sinyangchow
25 April 1933ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Sinyangchow
Diocese of Xinyang [Sinyang]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Sinyangchow Diocese of Xinyang [Sinyang]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Xinyang [Sinyang]
195013,6546,000,000.2%33134401122817ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.2, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 Apr 2018

Quantcast