Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lu Zhiyuan

Deceased

Bishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Liaoning)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1920²Born
11 Apr 199474.2Ordained BishopBishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien], China
11 Oct 199676.7DiedBishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lu Zhiyuan
Bishop Lu Zhiyuan (born 1920, died ) Bishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien]

  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast