Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Maximilien Paul Brulley de La Brunière, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Manchuria {Manciuria}, China

Titular Bishop of Tremithus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1816Born
26 May 184023.9ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
19 Dec 184024.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
1846²29.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Manchuria {Manciuria}, China
1846²29.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tremithus
31 Jul 184630.1DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Manchuria {Manciuria}, China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maximilien Paul Brulley de La Brunière
Father Maximilien Paul Brulley de La Brunière M.E.P. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Manchuria {Manciuria}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSartrouville, Seine-et-Oise, Diocese of Versailles, France
Death PlaceIsland of Waite

  • a priest for 5.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 376
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,846

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 28 Dec 2019

Quantcast