Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Horst, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Lwangwa, Zambia

Titular Bishop of Hermonthis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1902Born
5 Apr 193027.8Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
21 May 193835.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Lwangwa, Zambia
21 May 193835.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hermonthis
14 Aug 193836.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hermonthis
17 Sep 194644.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Lwangwa, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Horst
Bishop Heinrich Horst M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Lwangwa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDortmund-Kirchlinde, Germany

  • a priest for 16.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast