Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) Joost (Joseph) Van den Biesen, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Abercorn

Titular See: (Renounced the priesthood)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1913BornBreda, Netherlands
3 Jun 193926.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
12 Feb 194834.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Lwangwa, Zambia
12 Feb 194834.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tullia
30 May 194835.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tullia
8 Mar 195137.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Abercorn, Zambia
24 Jan 195844.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Abercorn, Zambia
24 Jan 195844.7ResignedTitular Bishop of Tullia
4 Nov 196754.5Laicized
4 Mar 200187.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Abercorn, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Joost (Joseph) Van den Biesen:
(Layman) Joost (Joseph) Van den Biesen M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Abercorn

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 52.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1948, Number 59
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015