Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Arshad

Bishop of Islamabad-Rawalpindi, Pakistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1965 Born
1 Nov 199126.1Ordained PriestPriest of Lahore, Pakistan
3 Jul 201347.8AppointedBishop of Faisalabad, Pakistan
1 Nov 201348.1Ordained BishopBishop of Faisalabad, Pakistan
12 Nov 201651.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Islamabad-Rawalpindi, Pakistan
8 Dec 201752.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Islamabad-Rawalpindi, Pakistan
10 Feb 201852.4InstalledArchbishop (Personal Title) of Islamabad-Rawalpindi, Pakistan

MicroData Summary for Joseph Arshad (VIAF: 167141382)
Archbishop Joseph Arshad (born ) Bishop of Islamabad-Rawalpindi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLahore
Ordained BishopSaints Peter and Paul, Cathedral, Faisalabad, Diocese of Faisalabad

Please contact the Archbishop through the Diocese of Islamabad-Rawalpindi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2013
  • ob: CB, 19 Aug 2013
  • c2: CB, 26 Aug 2013
  • c34: CB, 25 Oct 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2013, Number 147
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,980
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Nov 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 4 Mar 2018