Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne-Benoît Larue, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Bangueolo, Zambia

Titular Bishop of Thuburbo Minus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1865Born
28 May 189125.9Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
28 Jan 191347.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bangueolo, Zambia
28 Jan 191347.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thuburbo Minus
1 Apr 191347.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thuburbo Minus
5 Oct 193570.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Bangueolo, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Etienne-Benoît Larue
Bishop Etienne-Benoît Larue M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Bangueolo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Christophe-en-Brionnais, France

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,913, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast