Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Zoppetti, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Fabriano e Matelica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1735BornFoligno
23 Dec 175823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
26 Sep 178549.8AppointedBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy
29 Sep 178549.8Ordained BishopBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy
12 Jul 179660.6DiedBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Zoppetti:
Bishop Nicola Zoppetti O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Fabriano e Matelica

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013