Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Port Elizabeth

Dioecesis Portus Elizabethensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vincent Mduduzi Zungu, O.F.M., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 January 1951
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Cape Town {Kaapstad}
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: South Africa
  • Square Kilometers: 71,828 (27,743 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.catholic-pe.co.za/
  • Mailing Address: 4 How Ave., Port Elizabeth Central 6001; P.O. Box 12194, Moffat Place 6002, Port Elizabeth, South Africa
  • Telephone: (041)373.2854
  • Fax: 374.39.21

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope {Capo de Buona Speranza}
18 June 1818ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope {Capo de Buona Speranza} (erected)
30 July 1847Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope {Capo de Buona Speranza} Vicariate Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale}
30 July 1847Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope {Capo de Buona Speranza} Vicariate Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale}
15 November 1850Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale} Vicariate Apostolic of Natal (erected)
4 June 1886Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Natal
Vicariate Apostolic of Kimberley in Orange (erected)
12 June 1923Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale} Prefecture Apostolic of Gariep (erected)
20 February 1929Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale} Mission "Sui Iuris" of Queenstown (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Port Elizabeth
13 June 1939Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale} Vicariate Apostolic of Port Elizabeth
Diocese of Port Elizabeth
11 January 1951ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Port Elizabeth Diocese of Port Elizabeth

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Port Elizabeth
195025,365784,4913.2%5718753385256816ap1951
Diocese of Port Elizabeth
196950,748717,5007.1%7312855973956339ap1971
198065,0621,542,0004.2%5712699422237545ap1981
199079,2331,824,2334.3%409491,61751323045ap1991
199992,5962,542,5963.6%398471,97051417244ap2000
200092,7312,546,0003.6%397462,01551316744ap2001
200193,1192,693,1193.5%396452,06951115744ap2002
200298,1792,698,1793.6%366422,3374917544ap2003
200398,6482,698,6483.7%398472,0981016444ap2004
200498,8002,698,8003.7%369452,195141115844ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Jun 2014