Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Luigi Fontana, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Houkouang, China

Titular Bishop of Sinitis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1780Born
9 May 181736.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan), China
9 May 181736.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinitis
21 May 182039.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinitis
183857.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Houkouang, China
11 Jul 183858.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Houkouang, China

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Luigi Fontana
Bishop Giacomo Luigi Fontana M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Houkouang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontanaro, Diocese of Ivrea, Italy
Ordained BishopChengtu
Death PlaceHouy-sy

  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 346
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,820, Number 25
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast