Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Zubieta y Les, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Urubamba y Madre de Dios

Titular Bishop of Adraa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1864BornArquedas, Spain
1901²36.3AppointedPrefect of San Domingo de Urubamba, Peru
4 Jul 191348.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Urubamba y Madre de Dios, Peru
4 Jul 191348.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Adraa
14 Aug 191349.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adraa
19 Nov 192157.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Urubamba y Madre de Dios, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Zubieta y Les:
Bishop Ramón Zubieta y Les O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Urubamba y Madre de Dios

  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 43
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013