Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastian Breuning

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Adramyttium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1552Born
157825.9Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
23 Jun 158634.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
23 Jun 158634.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
6 Jul 158634.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
14 Feb 161866.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Sebastian Breuning (VIAF: 8576420)
Bishop Sebastian Breuning (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceAugsburg, Diocese of Augsburg
Error (223)St. Johannes, Augsburg, Diocese of Augsburg

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • c2: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1868
  • ob/c2+: AT, 29 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 May 2017