Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kaspar Zeiler

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Adramyttium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1605¹Born
162116.0Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
30 Jan 164540.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
30 Jan 164540.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
5 Mar 164540.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
25 Jun 164641.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Augsburg, Germany
18 Aug 166560.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Augsburg, Germany
2 Oct 168075.7ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
4 Jul 168176.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kaspar Zeiler
Bishop Kaspar Zeiler (born 1605, died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMainwangen

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 68
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast