Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gottfried Langwerth von Simmern

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

Titular Bishop of Germanicopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1669BornHattenheim
24 Jun 168717.5Converted
24 Jun 169828.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Regensburg, Germany
29 Jun 169828.5Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
10 May 171747.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
10 May 171747.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
11 Jul 171747.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
17 Jun 174171.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Gottfried Langwerth von Simmern:
Bishop Gottfried Langwerth von Simmern (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1717, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 209, and Page 328

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 1 Sep 2015