Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kindane Yebio

Bishop of Keren (Eritrean), Eritrea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1958 Born
30 Jun 198527.4Ordained PriestPriest of Keren (Eritrean), Eritrea
4 Jan 200344.9AppointedBishop of Keren (Eritrean), Eritrea
2 Mar 200345.1Ordained BishopBishop of Keren (Eritrean), Eritrea

MicroData Summary for Kindane Yebio
Bishop Kindane Yebio (born ) Bishop of Keren

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShinnara

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Keren (Eritrean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,343

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018