Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paulos Cardinal Tzadua

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian), Ethiopia

Cardinal-Priest of Santissimo Nome di Maria in Via Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1921Born
12 Mar 194422.5Ordained PriestPriest of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
1 Mar 197351.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
1 Mar 197351.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Abila in Palaestina
20 May 197351.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abila in Palaestina
24 Feb 197755.4AppointedArchbishop of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
25 May 198563.7Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 198563.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissimo Nome di Maria in Via Latina
11 Sep 199877.0RetiredArchbishop of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
11 Dec 200382.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian), Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Paulos Tzadua (VIAF: 63724389)
Paulos Cardinal Tzadua (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Addis Abeba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAddifini
Ordained BishopNativity of the Blessed Virgin Mary, Church, Addis Abeba, Archeparchy of Addis Abeba (Ethiopian)

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
  • a cardinal for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Deceased Cardinals (back), Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,280

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast