Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fikremariam Hagos Tsalim

Bishop of Segheneity (Eritrean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1970 BornAddis Abeba
21 Feb 199625.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Asmara (Ethiopian), Eritrea
21 Jul 199625.7Ordained PriestPriest of Asmara (Ethiopian), Eritrea
24 Feb 201241.3AppointedBishop of Segheneity (Eritrean), Eritrea
20 May 201241.5Ordained BishopBishop of Segheneity (Eritrean), Eritrea
27 May 201241.5InstalledBishop of Segheneity (Eritrean), Eritrea

MicroData Summary for Fikremariam Hagos Tsalim:
Bishop Fikremariam Hagos Tsalim (born ) Bishop of Segheneity

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Segheneity (Eritrean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Feb 2012
  • ob/i: CB, 8 Mar 2012
  • od/c01: CB, 14 May 2012
  • c2+: CB, 24 May 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,438

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015