Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kidane-Mariam Teklehaimanot

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Adigrat (Ethiopian), Ethiopia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1933Born
20 Dec 196431.2Ordained PriestPriest of Adigrat (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
12 Oct 198451.0AppointedBishop of Adigrat (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
10 Feb 198551.4Ordained BishopBishop of Adigrat (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
16 Nov 200168.1ResignedBishop of Adigrat (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
2 Jun 200975.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Adigrat (Ethiopian), Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Kidane-Mariam Teklehaimanot
Bishop Kidane-Mariam Teklehaimanot (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Adigrat

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonoxoito

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: JPG
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Jul 2017