Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cornelio Galleo Wigwigan

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Bontoc-Lagawe

Titular Bishop of Vagrauta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1942BornSabangan
26 Dec 196624.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bontoc-Lagawe, Philippines
19 Mar 200461.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bontoc-Lagawe, Philippines
19 Mar 200461.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Vagrauta
14 Jul 200462.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vagrauta
16 May 200563.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Bontoc-Lagawe, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Cornelio Galleo Wigwigan:
Bishop Cornelio Galleo Wigwigan (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Bontoc-Lagawe

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,653
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013