Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie Aubin, S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Southern Solomon Islands

Titular Bishop of Antiphellus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1882BornChâteaubriand, France
29 Jun 190623.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
8 Apr 193552.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Solomon Islands, Solomon Islands
8 Apr 193552.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Antiphellus
20 Oct 193552.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antiphellus
1958²75.0RetiredVicar Apostolic of Southern Solomon Islands, Solomon Islands
28 Aug 196784.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Southern Solomon Islands, Solomon Islands

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Aubin:
Bishop Jean-Marie Aubin S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Southern Solomon Islands

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013