Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor Agbanou

Bishop of Lokossa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1945 BornLokossa
10 Aug 197428.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lokossa, Benin
5 Jul 200054.5AppointedBishop of Lokossa, Benin
4 Nov 200054.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lokossa, Benin

MicroData Summary for Victor Agbanou:
Bishop Victor Agbanou (born ) Bishop of Lokossa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lokossa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,858
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013