Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio de Vergara, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1637Born
29 Sep 167942.0SelectedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
11 Mar 168042.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
9 Jun 168042.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
15 Nov 168346.1AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
9 Aug 168547.9SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Zamora, Spain
1 Oct 168548.0ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Zamora, Spain
7 Jan 169355.3DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Vergara
Archbishop Antonio de Vergara O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}
Ordained BishopSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 136, and Page 395
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 422
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,633
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 220, Number 1,367
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 19
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 78, Number 6,318

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast