Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Acorrà

Deceased

Archbishop of Oristano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1629¹Born
25 Sep 167950.7AppointedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
9 Jun 168051.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
30 Apr 168556.3AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
Dec 1702³73.9DiedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Acorrà
Archbishop Giuseppe Acorrà (born 1629, died Dec 1702) Archbishop of Oristano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCagliari

  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 82, and Page 95
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast