Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Lynch

Deceased

Archbishop of Tuam, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1624¹Born
8 Mar 166945.1AppointedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
26 May 166945.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
31 Oct 171389.8DiedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Lynch
Archbishop James Lynch (born 1624, died ) Archbishop of Tuam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGalway city, Co. Galway
Ordained BishopGent, Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
Death PlaceIrish College, Paris
Buried Place (Original)St. Paul's, Church, Paris

  • a bishop for 44.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 204, Number 1,276
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 393
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 9
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 26 Aug 2020

Quantcast