Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Quijada, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mondoņedo, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Sep 1690AppointedBishop of Mondoņedo, Spain
26 Nov 1690Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoņedo, Spain
31 May 1698DiedBishop of Mondoņedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Quijada
Bishop Miguel Quijada O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Mondoņedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Ordained BishopJauren

  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 269
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1,500, Page 233, Number 1,445
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 31
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Number 4,229

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast