Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Villacé y Vozmediano

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1648¹BornMayorga
27 Sep 168840.7AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
1689¹41.0Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
13 Apr 169345.2AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
9 Apr 169446.2DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Villacé y Vozmediano:
Bishop Juan de Villacé y Vozmediano (born 1648, died ) Bishop of Plasencia

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 214, and Page 316
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,059
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 231, Number 1,436
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1689, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015