Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camille Verfaillie, S.C.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Stanley-ville

Titular Bishop of Oëa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1892BornHooglede, Belgium
13 Jul 192432.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
1 Feb 193441.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Stanley Falls, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
1 Feb 193441.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Oëa
27 May 193441.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oëa
Mar 1958³65.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Stanley-ville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
22 Jan 198087.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Stanley-ville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Camille Verfaillie:
Bishop Camille Verfaillie S.C.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Stanley-ville

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 45.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013