Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop 聲gel Marquina y Corrales

Deceased

Bishop of Guadix


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1859BornHuidobro, Spain
4 Jun 188727.7Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 191353.8AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
7 Dec 191354.2Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
6 Sep 192262.9AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
1 Jan 192868.2DiedBishop of Guadix, Spain

MicroData Summary for 聲gel Marquina y Corrales:
Bishop 聲gel Marquina y Corrales (born , died ) Bishop of Guadix

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations 夗iscopales, Issue 1913, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013